McKinstry v. North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Annette McKinstry
Defendant: North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01331
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The court WITHDRAWS Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #9 . Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/11/19. (EBM)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #14 . Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/11/19. (EBM)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw #9 MOTION to Remand or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery by Annette McKinstry. (Wright, Richard)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery filed by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Sproule, R)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sproule, R)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The court reminds parties that submissions should comply, as much as practicable, with the page limit and similar requirements found in Appendix II of the Initial Order #8 (which is also available on the courts website at www.alnd.uscourts.gov under the court information for Judge Bowdre). Although the court realizes Appendix II deals with summary judgment motions, many of the requirements are applicable to motions for remand or leave to conduct discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/19/19. (EBM)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Regarding the briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand or Leave to Conduct Discovery [Doc. 9], Defendant shall have until October 1, 2019 to file a response. Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, by October 8, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/17/19. (EBM)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 ***WITHDRAWN*** MOTION to Remand or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery by Annette McKinstry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Wright, Richard) Modified on 10/11/2019 (JLC).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. ** The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/27/2019. (FNC)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Chief Karon O Bowdre. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-01331-KOB on all subsequent pleadings. The telephone status conference set for 9/20/2019 at 11:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. (AFS)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/21/2019. (AFS)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 9/30/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 9/30/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on 9/20/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/21/2019. (AFS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. filed by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Sproule, R)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
August 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, receipt_number (ALNDB4601099951)1126-3414208. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-903107.00., filed by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(AFS). (Sproule, R) Modified on 8/19/2019 (AFS).
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC.(Sproule, R)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-903107.00., filed by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinstry v. North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette McKinstry
Represented By: Richard Allen Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: R Gordon Sproule, Jr
Represented By: Mary Alexandra Parish
Represented By: Jennifer Devereaux Segers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?