Colonial Pipeline Co., Inc. v. CECO Pipeline Services Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Colonial Pipeline Co., Inc.
Defendant: CECO Pipeline Services Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01334
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER. ** CHANGING TIME ONLY ** Telephone/Status Conference set for Thursday, October 17, 2019 at 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. The call in information has been provided to the parties by email. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/11/2019. (FNC)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER setting status conference by telephone for 10/17/2019 at 12:00 Noon, Central time, before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. The court will provide the call in information to the parties by email. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 09/27/2019. (ALD)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/12/2019. (FNC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CECO Pipeline Services Co., Inc.. filed by CECO Pipeline Services Co., Inc. (McClendon, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CECO Pipeline Services Co., Inc..(McClendon, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colonial Pipeline Co., Inc.. CECO Pipeline Services Co., Inc. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (JLC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CECO Pipeline Services Co., Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 16th day of August, 2019. (JLC)
August 16, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3414082, NDAL receipt #B4601099947. (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 8/16/2019 (JLC).
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Colonial Pipeline Co., Inc.. (JLC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CECO Pipeline Services Co., Inc., filed by Colonial Pipeline Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colonial Pipeline Co., Inc. v. CECO Pipeline Services Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonial Pipeline Co., Inc.
Represented By: Alan D Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CECO Pipeline Services Co., Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E Whitehead
Represented By: Brian M McClendon
Represented By: Sean Thomas Herald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?