Seagle v. Baptist Medical Center Princeton et al
Plaintiff: Timothy M Seagle
Defendant: Mike Neuendorf, Baptist Medical Center Princeton, Sarah Dudley, Sandy Cobb, Tenet Healthcare Corporation and Howard Hacker
Case Number: 2:2019cv01338
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This Case is hereby reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 2:19-CV-1338-MHH on all future pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/26/2019. (JLC)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Baptist Medical Center Princeton, Sandy Cobb, Sarah Dudley, Howard Hacker, Mike Neuendorf, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, filed by Timothy M Seagle.(AFS)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Timothy M Seagle (AFS)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER the plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint within 14 days. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time prescribed may result in the dismissal of all claims for want of prosecution. Service of process will not begin until an amended complaint complying with this order is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/11/2019. (AFS)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - On August 19, 2019, the plaintiff filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis requesting to commence this action without prepayment of fees or costs or the giving of security. (Doc. #2 ). Having reviewed the plaintiffs motion, the undersigned finds that the plaintiff is indigent. Therefore, the motion is GRANTED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) to the extent the plaintiff may commence this action without prepayment of fees or costs or the giving of security. For these reasons, the plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint bearing this case number (2:19-cv-01338-JHE) on the first page within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this order. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time prescribed may result in the dismissal of all claims for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/20/2019. (KEK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE (Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing) by Timothy M Seagle (AFS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 8/19/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Timothy M Seagle. (AFS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baptist Medical Center Princeton, Sandy Cobb, Sarah Dudley, Howard Hacker, Mike Neuendorf, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, filed by Timothy M Seagle.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seagle v. Baptist Medical Center Princeton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Neuendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Medical Center Princeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenet Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy M Seagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?