Atchley v. Lowes Home Centers LLC
Plaintiff: Donna Atchley
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01349
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - A stipulation of dismissal, signed by all parties who have appeared, having been filed in this action, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that, this case is DISMISSED, with prejudice, costs to be taxed as paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/30/2019. (AFS)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal by Lowes Home Centers LLC. filed by Lowes Home Centers LLC (Stott, Joseph)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Consistent with the parties' request, the deadline to make an election as to magistrate judge jurisdiction is extended to October 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 9/26/2019. (CDG)
September 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 9/26/2019; Attorney W. Bright present by phone for pltf; Attorney F. Harrington present by phone for dft; conf adj. (AVC)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER (TIME CHANGE ONLY) Telephone Conference RESET for Thursday, September 26, 2019 at 10:15 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/25/2019. (AVC)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER -Due to the failure of all parties to appear for the telephone conference set for today, the telephone consent conference is RESET for Thursday, September 26, 2019 at 10:30 AM. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017; access code 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/24/2019. (AVC)
August 20, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, receipt_number 1126-3416065 (ALND B4601100028). (Stott, Joseph) Modified on 8/21/2019 (AFS).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/20/2019. (KEK)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 4, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after October 4, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on September 24, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/20/2019. (KEK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (KEK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (KEK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowes Home Centers LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-903274, filed by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atchley v. Lowes Home Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Atchley
Represented By: William E Bright, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?