Dixon v. Badger Daylighting Inc
Plaintiff: Richard Dixon
Defendant: Badger Daylighting Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01379
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PARTIALLY REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER. This matter was reassigned to the undersigned Judge on June 3, 2020. To bring clarity to the schedule in this case, the court sets out specific deadlines as follows. The dates set out in this order govern this matter. All other provisions set out in the court's previous scheduling order (Doc. 21) remain in effect. Discovery due by 11/19/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2020; Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2020; Status Conference by telephone set for 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Anna M Manasco. The court will provide the participating information to the parties by email. This case should be ready for trial by May, 2021. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/24/2020. (FNC)
June 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Anna M. Manasco. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1379-AMM on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - For any deadlines that had not expired as of March 17, 2020, the new deadlines shall be calculated by adding 50 days to the date set out in the operative scheduling order. This order does not apply to any briefing schedules that were stayed under the General Orders. If applicable, the court will enter an amended briefing schedule by separate order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/1/2020. (KEK)
March 11, 2020 Filing 22 PLAINTIFFS Initial Disclosure by Richard Dixon. (KEK)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER governing further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown: Discovery due by 9/30/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2020; Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/17/20. (SAC)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/17/20. (SAC)
January 8, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1379-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Phillips, William)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Presently pending are motions to allow Jamila S. Mensah and Omar El-Halwagi to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Badger Daylighting, Inc. (Docs. #15 , #16 ). The motions, which include the information required under Local Rule 83.1(b) and are accompanied by the required fees, are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/19/19. (MRR, )
December 19, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3499794 (B4601102818). (Phillips, William) Modified on 12/20/2019 (MRR, ).
December 19, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3499787 (B4601102816). (Phillips, William) Modified on 12/20/2019 (MRR, ).
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Omar El-Halwagi Motion is RIPE 12/19/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Badger Daylighting Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phillips, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jamila S. Mensah Motion is RIPE 12/19/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Badger Daylighting Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phillips, William)
December 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 12/17/2019; atty Brock Phillips present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 10:00 a.m. on December 17, 2019. (Doc. #12 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/17/2019. (MSN)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/3/19. (MRR, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than January 10, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after January 10, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on December 17, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/3/19. (MRR, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Badger Daylighting Inc (Phillips, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Badger Daylighting Inc.(Phillips, William)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Dixon. Badger Daylighting Inc served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (KEK)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Badger Daylighting Inc., sent to US Marshals for service (MRR, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER- The pltf's motion seeking in forma pauperis status (Doc #6 ) is GRANTED to the extent it seeks leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee; Pltf's motions (Docs #3 , #6 ) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent the undersigned declines to appoint an attorney to represent the pltf at this time.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/8/19. (MRR, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 9/16/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Richard Dixon. (MRR, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Dixon (MRR, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 8/23/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Richard Dixon. (MRR, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE (Untitled Document) by Richard Dixon (MRR, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Badger Daylighting Inc, filed by Richard Dixon.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Badger Daylighting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badger Daylighting Inc
Represented By: Jamila S. Mensah
Represented By: David B Block
Represented By: William Brock Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?