McTerry v. Jetty
Plaintiff: Darrel McTerry
Defendant: Nirmala R Jetty and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01402
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 BRIEFING SCHEDULE ORDER re #3 Motion and Brief to Dismiss, or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment - A response to the motion is due on or before October 15, 2019. A reply is due on or before October 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/28/19. (SAC)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Substitute Party. Nirmala R Jetty terminated. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/27/2019. (RLW)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Hood, Jack)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party by United States of America. (KEK)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number sm-2018-000529, filed by United States of America.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McTerry v. Jetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel McTerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirmala R Jetty
Represented By: Jack B Hood
Represented By: Jay E Town
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jack B Hood
Represented By: Jay E Town
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?