Medline Industries Inc v. Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc
Plaintiff: Medline Industries Inc
Defendant: Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01415
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Dyar on behalf of Medline Industries Inc (Dyar, Robert)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc.(Kimble, Cavender)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc, filed by Medline Industries Inc.(McLeod, Aaron)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/25/2019. (BST, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/25/2019. (BST, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc, Medline Industries Inc. (BST, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 motion for leave to appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 09/25/2019. (SUH)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 motion for leave to appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 09/25/2019. (SUH)
September 24, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3441105. (Kimble, Cavender) ALND receipt# B4601100800. Modified on 9/25/2019 (KAM, ).
September 24, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3441086. (Kimble, Cavender) ALND receipt# B4601100799. Modified on 9/25/2019 (KAM).
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Motion is RIPE 9/24/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc. (Kimble, Cavender)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Motion is RIPE 9/24/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kimble, Cavender)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT (KAM)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc.(Kimble, Cavender)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc. mailed certified mail (KAM)
August 28, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3422685. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc, filed by Medline Industries Inc.(KAM). (McLeod, Aaron) NDAL rec# B4601100190 Modified on 8/29/2019 (KAM, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Medline Industries Inc. (KAM)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc, filed by Medline Industries Inc.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medline Industries Inc v. Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sustainability Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medline Industries Inc
Represented By: Stephen A Rowe
Represented By: Aaron G McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?