Myrick v. Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donald J Myrick
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc, Omnitrax Inc and Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01417
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 49:20109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ray, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC, Omnitrax Inc - Notice of Receipt and Review of Initial Order (Ray, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Notice of Receipt and Review of Initial Order by Donald J Myrick. filed by Donald J Myrick (Tucker, William)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by CSX Transportation Inc Notice of Receipt and Review of Initial Order (Richardson, Morris)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/7/2019. (KEK)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1417-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 8, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 8, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 2:30 p.m. on October 23, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/25/19. (MRR, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/25/19. (MRR, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omnitrax Inc. filed by Omnitrax Inc (Ray, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC. filed by Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC (Ray, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Omnitrax Inc.(Ray, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC.(Ray, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation Inc. filed by CSX Transportation Inc (Richardson, Morris)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSX Transportation Inc.(Richardson, Morris) Modified text on 9/24/2019 (MRR, ).
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; CSX Transportation Inc served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (MRR, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Omnitrax Inc served (no date on green card) (MRR, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC, CSX Transportation Inc, Omnitrax Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
August 29, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601100202 (MRR, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Donald J Myrick. (MRR, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donald J Myrick.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myrick v. Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc
Represented By: Morris Wade Richardson
Represented By: David E Malick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnitrax Inc
Represented By: Al Foster Teel
Represented By: Michael W Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama & Tennessee River Railway LLC
Represented By: Al Foster Teel
Represented By: Michael W Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J Myrick
Represented By: William C Tucker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?