Holliyan v. AmeriFinacial Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Morgan Holliyan
Defendant: AmeriFinacial Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01438
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schexnailder, Rachael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford W Botes on behalf of Morgan Holliyan (Botes, Bradford)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Othat the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 11/14/2019 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 10/30/2019 before Magistrate Judge John E. Ott; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/1/2019. (BST)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/4/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/1/2019. (BST, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmeriFinacial Solutions LLC. filed by AmeriFinacial Solutions LLC (Moore, Neal)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AmeriFinacial Solutions LLC.(Moore, Neal)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Holliyan. AmeriFinacial Solutions LLC served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (KAM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AmeriFinacial Solutions LLC.mailed certified mail (KAM)
September 3, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3425713. (Philipps, David)
September 3, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3425712. (Philipps, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3425707. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Morgan Holliyan, filed by Morgan Holliyan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KAM). (Philipps, David)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting the motion of counsel to appear pro hac vice in this matter. #3 The granting of the motion is conditional upon on the paying of the required fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 9/3/2019. (Ott, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV Motion is RIPE 8/30/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Morgan Holliyan. (Attachments: #1 Local counsel consent)(KAM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Morgan Holliyan. (KAM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morgan Holliyan, filed by Morgan Holliyan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holliyan v. AmeriFinacial Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Holliyan
Represented By: Bradford W Botes
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriFinacial Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?