Hardy et al v. Johnson Bros Corp et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Hardy, Jr and Tyesha Denise Allen
Defendant: Keith Randall Fultz and Johnson Bros Corp
Case Number: 2:2019cv01439
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Keith Randall Fultz (MRR, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melvin Hardy, Jr, Tyesha Denise Allen. Keith Randall Fultz waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/14/2019. (Tanner, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Russell Q. Allison, Esq. obo Keith Randel Fultz on 10/9/2017 by Tyesha Denise Allen, Melvin Hardy, Jr. (Tanner, James) Modified text on 10/17/2019 (MRR, ).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/15/19. (MRR, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 29, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 29, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 2:00 p.m. on November 13, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/15/19. (MRR, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Johnson Bros ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Keith Randall Fultz, Johnson Bros Corp.(Allison, Russell)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Keith Randall Fultz's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Keith Randall Fultz, Johnson Bros Corp.(Allison, Russell)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Johnson Bros Corp served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (MRR, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Keith Randall Fultz, Johnson Bros Corp., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Curtis Tanner on behalf of Tyesha Denise Allen, Melvin Hardy, Jr (Tanner, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3425618 (B4601100274). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Keith Randall Fultz, Johnson Bros Corp, filed by Melvin Hardy, Jr, Tyesha Denise Allen.(MRR, ). (Cory, Ernest) Modified on 9/4/2019 (MRR, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Tyesha Denise Allen, Melvin Hardy, Jr. (MRR, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith Randall Fultz, Johnson Bros Corp, filed by Melvin Hardy, Jr, Tyesha Denise Allen.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy et al v. Johnson Bros Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Randall Fultz
Represented By: Russell Q Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Bros Corp
Represented By: Russell Q Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Hardy, Jr
Represented By: Ernest Cory
Represented By: Andrew S Herring
Represented By: James Curtis Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyesha Denise Allen
Represented By: Ernest Cory
Represented By: Andrew S Herring
Represented By: James Curtis Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?