Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc. v. Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Madonna Linville, Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc. and Brad Linville
Case Number: 2:2019cv01467
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER governing further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown: Discovery due by 6/30/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2020; Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/4/19. (SAC)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: The parties are instructed to review Local Rule 5.3 regarding the non-filing of discovery materials in civil cases. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/2/19. (SAC)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/2/19. (SAC)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc. Notice of Intent to Serve Rule 45 Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Verizon Wireless, #2 Exhibit Subpoena to Verizon Wireless)(Phillips, Wesley)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of service of discovery documents regarding motion by Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc.. Related document: #15 filed by Madonna Linville, Brad Linville, Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc., Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc..(Phillips, Wesley) Modified on 10/2/2019 (KAM, ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this case is reassigned toJudge Annemarie Carney Axon. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00431. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 4, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Transfer Venue (Doc. #15 ) is GRANTED and that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/4/2019. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Transfer Venue by Brad Linville, Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc., Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc., and Madonna Linville . (Clark, Brian) Modified on 8/29/2019 to add as filed on behalf of additional parties (kh, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clark, Brian) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Brad Linville. (Clark, Brian) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Madonna Linville. (Appell, Roger) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Brad Linville, Madonna Linville, Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than August 29, 2019.Previously, the parties were notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and the right to consent or request reassignment. See Attached Explanation. Therefore, as indicated in the notice of assignment, the parties should now confirm their decision in writing. See Rembert v. Apfel, 213 F.3d 1331 (11th Cir. 2000). Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before August 29, 2019. DO NOT FILE THE FORM ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/8/2019. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc.. (Clark, Brian) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brad Linville, Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc..(Clark, Brian) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Madonna Linville.(Appell, Roger) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc.. (Phillips, Wesley) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc.. Brad Linville served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; Madonna Linville served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brad Linville, Madonna Linville, Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc. and returned to counsel for personal service. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
June 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brad Linville, Madonna Linville, Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053968.), filed by Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc. v. Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madonna Linville
Represented By: Roger C Appell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linville Memorial Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Linville
Represented By: Brian M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffcoat Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Wesley L Phillips
Represented By: Vincent L Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?