Managed Health Care Administration, Inc et al v. New Directions Behavioral Health LLC
Plaintiff: Managed Health Care Administration, Inc and Alabama Psychiatric Services PC
Defendant: New Directions Behavioral Health LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01469
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; costs taxed as paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/4/2019. (KAM)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alabama Psychiatric Services PC, Managed Health Care Administration, Inc (Yancey, Perry)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to New Directions Behavioral Health LLC given back to plaintiff for service. (AFS)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Upon the Motion to Appoint United States Marshal filed herein by Petitioners, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that United States Marshal Ronald Miller for the District of Kansas be and hereby is appointed pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 9 to serve the Summons and Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award on Respondent, New Directions Behavioral Health, LLC. It is further ORDERED that he make his return to the Clerk of this Court forthwith. Petitioners are responsible for any costs associated with service. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/9/2019. (AFS)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Appoint United States Marshal by Alabama Psychiatric Services PC, Managed Health Care Administration, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yancey, Perry)
September 4, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3427289 (ALND B 4601100375). (Yancey, Perry) Modified on 9/5/2019 (AFS).
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award against New Directions Behavioral Health LLC, filed by Alabama Psychiatric Services PC, Managed Health Care Administration, Inc.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Managed Health Care Administration, Inc et al v. New Directions Behavioral Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Managed Health Care Administration, Inc
Represented By: Rodney E Miller
Represented By: James Matthew Stephens
Represented By: Perry Michael Yancey
Represented By: Courtney Cooper Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Psychiatric Services PC
Represented By: Rodney E Miller
Represented By: James Matthew Stephens
Represented By: Perry Michael Yancey
Represented By: Courtney Cooper Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Directions Behavioral Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?