Moon v. Red Rock Realty Co
Plaintiff: Debra Moon
Defendant: Red Rock Realty Co and CEO Brad
Case Number: 2:2019cv01470
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Staci Cornelius. (Doc. #6 ). The Court sets this matter for a telephone conference on November 6, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. Ms. Moon shall please dial (877) 848-7030 and enter 4974062 to participate. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/23/2019. (KEK)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. The parties have declined to consent to the exercise of final jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). In accordance with the General Order this case is hereby reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 2:19-CV-1470-MHH on all future pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/21/2019. (JLC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE (Untitled document) to Order (Doc #4 ) filed by Debra Moon. (MRR, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- Debra Moon's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc #2 ) is GRANTED to the extent Moon may commence this action without paying the filing fee and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent the undersigned declines to appoint an attorney in this action at this time; Moon is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction; Service of process will not begin unless and until Moon establishes a basis for this court's jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/3/19. (MRR, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 9/5/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Debra Moon. (MRR, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Red Rock Realty Co, filed by Debra Moon.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Red Rock Realty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Realty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO Brad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?