Blackman v. Travelers Companies Inc, The
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Blackman
Defendant: Travelers Companies Inc, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv01495
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and the Court hereby STAYS this case pending the outcome of the Arbitration.The parties will file a Joint Status Report with the Court on or before January 7, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/28/2019. (JLC)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration filed by Kaitlyn Blackman. (Goldfarb, Jon)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Karon O. Bowdre. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1495-KOB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER re #4 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration filed by Travelers Companies Inc. On or before 10/24/2019, Plaintiff shall show cause, if any exists, as to why the motion should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/10/2019. (RCP)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration by Travelers Companies Inc, The. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cecil Murphy)(Bradford, Stacey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Travelers Companies Inc, The., returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
September 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3431271 (B4601100529). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Companies Inc, The, filed by Kaitlyn Blackman.(MRR, ). (Goldfarb, Jon) Modified on 9/11/2019 (MRR, ).
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge (MRR, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Companies Inc, The, filed by Kaitlyn Blackman.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackman v. Travelers Companies Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Blackman
Represented By: Christina Maxine Malmat
Represented By: L William Smith
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Companies Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?