Henderson v. Cooper
Plaintiff: Nettie Marie Henderson
Defendant: Nate Cooper
Case Number: 2:2019cv01500
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1500-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER- The pltf filed an amended complaint on October 23, 2019 (Doc #5 ); While the amended complaint does not provide a basis for exercising federal subject matter jurisdiction; The General Order calls for reassignment to a district judge following the occurrence of the first of three "triggering events" absent unanimous consent; None of these events have occurred and it appears that no such event will occur in a timely manner; The case is now due to be assigned to a district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/24/19. (MRR, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nettie Marie Henderson.(MRR, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- Pltf's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc #2 ) is due to be GRANTED to the extent she may commence this action without paying the filing fee; The motion is due to be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent the undersigned declines to appoint an attorney to represent Henderson at this time; Pltf is ORDERED to file an amended compliant within fourteen (14) calendar days from the entry date of this order; Service of process will not begin unless and until an amended complaint complying with this order is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/9/19. (MRR, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 9/9/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Nettie Marie Henderson. (MRR, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nate Cooper, filed by Nettie Marie Henderson.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nettie Marie Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?