Chapman v. US Dept of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Debra Keef Chapman
Defendant: US Dept of Veterans Affairs, United States of America and Wound Care Nurse-in-Charge
Case Number: 2:2019cv01516
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Karon O. Bowdre. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1516-KOB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER- The pltf was ordered to show cause within fourteen (14) calendar days why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of federal suject matter jurisdiction (Doc #4 ); The pltf has failed to comply with the order; The General Order calls for reassignment to a district judge following the occurrence of the first of three "triggering events" absent unanimous consent; None of these events have occurred and it appears that no such event will occur in a timely manner; This case is due to be assigned to a district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/7/19. (MRR, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc #2 ) is due to be GRANTED to the extent she may commence this action without paying the filing fee; The motion is due to be DENIED without prejudice to the extent the undersigned declines to appoint an attorney to represent the plaintiff at this time; The plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing within fourteen (14) calendar days from the entry of this order why this action should not be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; To the extent plaintiff has exhausted her administrative remedies, she may comply with this order by filing an amended complaint; Further instructions within. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/9/19. (MRR, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion is RIPE 9/12/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed, by Debra Keef Chapman. (MRR, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US Dept of Veterans Affairs, filed by Debra Keef Chapman.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. US Dept of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Keef Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Dept of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wound Care Nurse-in-Charge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?