Catanese v. Trussville City of
Plaintiff: Michael Catanese
Defendant: Trussville City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv01517
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Set Hearings pursuant to #14 Scheduling Order: Telephone Conference set for 4/14/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Corey L Maze. Telephone Conference set for 6/23/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Corey L Maze. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Anniston, AL before Judge Corey L Maze. (SRD)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/2020.. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix II)(SRD)
October 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L Maze: Scheduling Conference held on 10/28/2019. (SRD)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 01:30 PM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Corey L. Maze. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 10/23/2019. (SRD)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hale, Thomas)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 10/1/2019. (SRD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Corey L. Maze. The telephone conference set for October 28, 2019 is CANCELLED. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1517-CLM on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/27/2019. (AFS)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 11/12/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 11/12/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:45 a.m. on 10/28/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/27/2019. (AFS)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Trussville City of.(Hale, Thomas)
September 25, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Trussville City of answer due 9/27/2019. (AFS)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File. Defendant is DIRECTED to file its answer by Friday, September 27, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 9/25/2019. (CDG)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Answer by Trussville City of. (Hale, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - plaintiff shall show cause within 14 days why this action should not be dismissed for want of prosecution; Show Cause Response due by 10/8/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/24/2019. (KAM)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by W Hill Sewell on behalf of Trussville City of (Sewell, W)
September 12, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3433196 (ALND B4601100590).(Hale, Thomas) Modified on 9/13/2019 (AFS).
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trussville City of from Circuit Court of Jefferson County Alabama, case number 01-CV-2019-903610.00., filed by Trussville City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catanese v. Trussville City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Catanese
Represented By: Scott Thomas Morro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trussville City of
Represented By: Thomas S Hale
Represented By: W Hill Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?