Pruitt v. Fourth Avenue Super Market Inc
Plaintiff: James Pruitt
Defendant: Fourth Avenue Super Market Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01520
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Pruitt. (Wrady, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 12/9/2019 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 11/25/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/25/2019. (BST, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/29/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/25/2019. (BST, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Fourth Avenue Super Market, Inc. Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response to the motion to dismiss by November 8, 2019; Defendant may file a reply by November 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 10/25/2019. (SJB)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fourth Avenue Super Market Inc. filed by Fourth Avenue Super Market Inc (Tyra, Bryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Fourth Avenue Super Market Inc. (Tyra, Bryan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Pruitt. Fourth Avenue Super Market Inc served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Wrady, Joshua)
September 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3434477. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Fourth Avenue Super Market Inc, filed by James Pruitt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(KAM, ). (Wrady, Joshua)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fourth Avenue Super Market Inc, filed by James Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(KAM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruitt v. Fourth Avenue Super Market Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pruitt
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Wrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fourth Avenue Super Market Inc
Represented By: Bryan Scott Tyra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?