Carr v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lois Carr
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Bayer AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc and Bayer Pharma AG
Case Number: 2:2019cv01522
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL No. 2592: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Eastern District of Louisiana for inclusion in MDL No. 2592; Certified copies of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically mailed to the Clerk of Court in the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by the Honorable Eldon E. Fallon.(JLC)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lois Carr. Bayer Healthcare LLC served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (JLC)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lois Carr. Janssen Research & Development LLC served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/14/2019; Johnson & Johnson Company served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (JLC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lois Carr. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (JLC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lois Carr. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (JLC)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company via certified U.S. Mail on this the 18th day of September, 2019. (JLC)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lois Carr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Austin-Hatcher, Monica)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lois Carr. (Austin-Hatcher, Monica)
September 13, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3433927 (ALND B4601100619) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company, filed by Lois Carr.(KEK). (Austin-Hatcher, Monica) Modified on 9/16/2019 (KEK).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company, filed by Lois Carr.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Carr
Represented By: Monica D Austin-Hatcher
Represented By: LaShunta M White-Boler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?