BBVA USA Bancshares Inc v. Bandy et al
Plaintiff: BBVA USA Bancshares Inc
Defendant: Deontray McClain, Leyshun D Bandy, Rodneisha C Jackson and Belton Eugene Nettles
Case Number: 2:2019cv01548
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Alias Summons Issued as to Belton Eugene Nettles, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Rodneisha C Jackson, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted- Unclaimed as to Rodneisha C Jackson. (MRR, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Deontray McClain served (no date on green card) (MRR, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Belton Eugene Nettles served (no date on green card) (MRR, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Leyshun D Bandy served on 9/28/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (MRR, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
September 18, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601100687 (MRR, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 18, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by BBVA USA Bancshares Inc. (MRR, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BBVA USA Bancshares Inc.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BBVA USA Bancshares Inc v. Bandy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBVA USA Bancshares Inc
Represented By: L Conrad Anderson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deontray McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leyshun D Bandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodneisha C Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belton Eugene Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?