Wade v. Folsom Metal Products Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Kay Wade
Defendant: Aubrey Clinton Folsom, Oak Mountain Tissue LLC and Folsom Metal Products Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01568
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Kay Wade. All Defendants. (Hobbs, Chad)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aubrey Clinton Folsom, Folsom Metal Products, Inc. and Oak Mountain Tissue, LLC, returned to Plaintiff for service via USPS on this the 26th day of September, 2019. (JLC)
September 25, 2019 Filing Fee:$ 400, receipt_number 1126-3442013 (ALND B4601100822). (Hobbs, Chad)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aubrey Clinton Folsom, Folsom Metal Products Inc, Oak Mountain Tissue LLC, filed by Sandra Kay Wade.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Folsom Metal Products Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aubrey Clinton Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Mountain Tissue LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Folsom Metal Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Kay Wade
Represented By: Chad L Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?