Lane v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Bernadine Marshall Lane
Defendant: Bank of America, Coats & Coats Inc, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Sirote & Permutt PC, Bayview Loan Servicing LLC, Red Mountain Title LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv01569
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #16 Notice (Other) by Bernadine Marshall Lane. (KEK)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Because Ms. Lane did not comply with the court's instructions regarding the filing of an amended complaint, the court DISMISSES this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/29/2019. (KEK)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of filing: Judicial Notice & Demand by Bernadine Marshall Lane. (KEK)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - For the reasons explained below, the court GRANTS Federal National Mortgage Association's motion. (Doc. #4 ). In addition, the court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the remaining motions. (Docs. #6 , #8 , #11 , #14 ). The court GRANTS the motions to the extent Defendants seek a more definite statement of the claims asserted against them. The court DENIES the motions to the extent Defendants seek dismissal of the complaint. Accordingly, the court STRIKES Ms. Lane's complaint and will give her an opportunity to file an amended complaint. On or before October 25, 2019, Ms. Lane SHALL file an amended complaint that corrects the shotgun pleading deficiencies identified above. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/4/2019. (KEK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss SIROTE AND PERMUTT, P.C. AND RED MOUNTAIN TITLE, LLCS MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTIONS FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Red Mountain Title LLC, Sirote & Permutt PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kiser, Jacob)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Red Mountain Title LLC, Sirote & Permutt PC. filed by Red Mountain Title LLC, Sirote & Permutt PC (Kiser, Jacob)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Kiser on behalf of Red Mountain Title LLC, Sirote & Permutt PC (Kiser, Jacob)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank. (Stanley, Jennifer)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank. filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Stanley, Jennifer)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1569-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Bank of America. (Gerhardt, Graham)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America. filed by Bank of America (Gerhardt, Graham)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC. (Bottcher, Christopher)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 24, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3440619 (B4601100794). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number CV-2019-1569., filed by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(MRR, ) Modified on 9/23/2019 (MRR, ).. (Triplett, Lacy) Modified on 9/24/2019 (MRR, ).
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Reeves, T)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association. filed by Federal National Mortgage Association (Reeves, T)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC. filed by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC (Triplett, Lacy)
September 23, 2019 COMPLAINT against All Defedants, filed by Bernadine Marshall Lane.- Deemed filed August 16, 2019, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p 16 of 68)(MRR, ) Modified on 9/23/2019 (MRR, ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number CV-2019-1569., filed by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(MRR, ) Modified on 9/23/2019 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadine Marshall Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Graham W Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coats & Coats Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Jennifer Ashley Stanley
Represented By: John David Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirote & Permutt PC
Represented By: Jacob A Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Christopher A Bottcher
Represented By: Lacy Michele Triplett
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Mountain Title LLC
Represented By: Jacob A Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Christopher A Bottcher
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?