Gover et al v. Northstar Location Sercices LLC
Plaintiff: Shavon Gover and Aaron Gover
Defendant: Northstar Location Sercices LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01582
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE-Plaintiff has submitted a notice of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Doc. 5). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the case be and hereby is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, costs to be taxed as paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/25/2019. (AKD) Modified on 10/25/2019 (AKD, ).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **VACATE**TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline for #5 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition to the motion must be filed by November 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 10/24/2019. (CLS2) Modified on 10/24/2019 (AKD, ). Modified on 10/24/2019 (AKD, ).
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss by Aaron Gover. (Walker, M)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shavon Gover, Aaron Gover. Northstar Location Sercices LLC served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Walker, M)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Northstar Location Sercices LLC mailed to plaintiff's counsel in SASE for service. (AFS)
September 24, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3441004 (ALND B4601100795). (Walker, M)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northstar Location Sercices LLC, filed by Shavon Gover, Aaron Gover.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gover et al v. Northstar Location Sercices LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Location Sercices LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shavon Gover
Represented By: M Brandon Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Gover
Represented By: M Brandon Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?