Jenkins v. ABC Employment Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: Alicia D. Jenkins
Defendant: ABC Employment Holdings LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01589
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/18/2019. (FNC)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE- The status conference set for November 18, 2019 is CANCELLED. (MRR, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Karon O. Bowdre. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1589-KOB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance W Parmer on behalf of ABC Employment Holdings LLC (Parmer, Lance)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 10:30 a.m. on November 18, 2019. (Doc. #7 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/13/2019. (MSN)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABC Employment Holdings LLC. filed by ABC Employment Holdings LLC (Vreeland, Albert)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/30/19. (MRR, )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than December 12, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after December 12, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for November 18, 2019 at 10:30 a.m.. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/30/19. (MRR, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ABC Employment Holdings LLC.(Vreeland, Albert)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed ABC Employment Holdings LLC served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (MRR, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ABC Employment Holdings LLC., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Alicia D. Jenkins. (Cooks, Roderick)
October 2, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3447633 (B4601100988). related document #1 COMPLAINT against ABC Employment Holdings LLC, filed by Alicia D. Jenkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EEOC Docs)(MRR, ). (Cooks, Roderick) Modified on 10/2/2019 (MRR, ).
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Employment Holdings LLC, filed by Alicia D. Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Docs)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. ABC Employment Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia D. Jenkins
Represented By: Charity Gilchrist-Davis
Represented By: Roderick T Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Employment Holdings LLC
Represented By: Albert L Vreeland, II
Represented By: Lance W Parmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?