Vulcan Materials Company et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: DMG Equipment Company LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, TCS Materials LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, Vulcan Materials Company, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, CalMat Co, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, R C Smith Companies LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Azusa Rock LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC and Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, CSX Transportation Inc, BNSF Railway Company and Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01606
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER finding motion to dismiss as Moot #16 and Granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file their amended complaint by December 17, 2019. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by January 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/27/2019. (AKD)
November 26, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss - Stipulated Motion is RIPE 11/26/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Azusa Rock LLC, CalMat Co, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, R C Smith Companies LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, TCS Materials LLC, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Vulcan Materials Company. (Buck, Brannon)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/19/2019. (AKD)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than December 30, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after December 30, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for December 16, 2019 at 10:15 am. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/19/2019. (AKD)
November 18, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation Inc. filed by CSX Transportation Inc (Richardson, Morris)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline for #16 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition to the motion must be filed by December 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/18/2019. (CLS2)
November 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Ford, Sara)
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Anne Ford on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Ford, Sara)
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company. filed by BNSF Railway Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kendrick, Kermit)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company (McGivaren, Crawford)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation Inc, Norfolk Southern, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Kendrick, Kermit)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due November 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/5/2019. (CLS2)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, Motion is RIPE 11/5/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Azusa Rock LLC, CalMat Co, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, R C Smith Companies LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, TCS Materials LLC, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Vulcan Materials Company. (Buck, Brannon)
October 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601101515 (AKD)
October 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3462956 (ALND receipt# B4601101514). (Buck, Brannon) Modified on 10/23/2019 (AKD, ).
October 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3462954(ALND receipt# B4601101516). (Buck, Brannon) Modified on 10/23/2019 (AKD, ).
October 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3462952 ALND receipt# B460110513). (Buck, Brannon) Modified on 10/23/2019 (AKD).
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McCartney Construction Company Inc, Triangle Rock Products LLC, CalMat Co, Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Vulcan Materials Company, TCS Materials LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, R C Smith Companies LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Azusa Rock LLC, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc. BNSF Railway Company served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; CSX Transportation Inc served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (AKD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Union Pacific Railroad Company, McCartney Construction Company Inc, Triangle Rock Products LLC, CalMat Co, Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Vulcan Materials Company, TCS Materials LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, R C Smith Companies LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Azusa Rock LLC, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (AKD)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #6 , #7 , #8 and #9 Motions to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorneys Stephen R. Neuwirth, Sami H. Rashid, Monica E. Tarazi and Robert P. Vance, Jr., but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/11/2019. (AVC)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation Inc, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company mailed certified mail. (AKD)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert P. Vance, Jr. Motion is RIPE 10/10/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Azusa Rock LLC, CalMat Co, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, R C Smith Companies LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, TCS Materials LLC, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Vulcan Materials Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Buck, Brannon)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Monica E. Tarazi Motion is RIPE 10/10/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Azusa Rock LLC, CalMat Co, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, R C Smith Companies LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, TCS Materials LLC, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Vulcan Materials Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Buck, Brannon)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sami H. Rashid Motion is RIPE 10/10/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Azusa Rock LLC, CalMat Co, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, R C Smith Companies LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, TCS Materials LLC, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Vulcan Materials Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Buck, Brannon)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen R. Neuwirth Motion is RIPE 10/10/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Azusa Rock LLC, CalMat Co, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, R C Smith Companies LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, TCS Materials LLC, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Vulcan Materials Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Buck, Brannon)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Request for service by certified mail filed by Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Azusa Rock LLC, CalMat Co, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, R C Smith Companies LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, TCS Materials LLC, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Vulcan Materials Company. (Buck, Brannon)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Azusa Rock LLC, CalMat Co, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, R C Smith Companies LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, TCS Materials LLC, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Vulcan Materials Company. filed by Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Azusa Rock LLC, CalMat Co, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, R C Smith Companies LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, TCS Materials LLC, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Vulcan Materials Company (Buck, Brannon)
October 5, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3450340 (ALND receipt# B4601101107). related document #1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation Inc, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company, filed by McCartney Construction Company Inc, Triangle Rock Products LLC, CalMat Co, Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Vulcan Materials Company, TCS Materials LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, R C Smith Companies LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Azusa Rock LLC, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(KEK). (Buck, Brannon) Modified on 10/7/2019 (AKD, ).
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Azusa Rock LLC, CalMat Co, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, McCartney Construction Company Inc, R C Smith Companies LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, TCS Materials LLC, Triangle Rock Products LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Vulcan Materials Company. (KEK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation Inc, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company, filed by McCartney Construction Company Inc, Triangle Rock Products LLC, CalMat Co, Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC, S&G Concrete Company LLC, Aggregates USA LLC, Vulcan Materials Company, TCS Materials LLC, Maryland Stone LLC, Harper Brothers LLC, Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina, Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC, R C Smith Companies LLC, Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC, Atlantic Granite Company, Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC, Vulcan Construction Materials LLC, Arundel Company LLC, Virginia Concrete Company LLC, Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC, Maryland Rock Industries LLC, Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC, Legacy Vulcan LLC, DMG Equipment Company LLC, Azusa Rock LLC, Fulton Concrete Company LLC, Florida Rock Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vulcan Materials Company et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DMG Equipment Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McCartney Construction Company Inc
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCS Materials LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland Stone LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vulcan Materials Company
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&G Concrete Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legacy Vulcan LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vulcan Aggregates Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arundel Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chem-Marine Corporation of South Carolina
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CalMat Co
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vulcan Construction Materials LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fulton Concrete Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R C Smith Companies LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Rock Industries Inc
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregates USA (Sparta) LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Creek Mira Mesa LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Granite Company
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triangle Rock Products LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregates USA (Augusta) LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azusa Rock LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregates USA (Macon) LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregates USA LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland Rock Industries LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harper Brothers LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Concrete Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregates USA (Savannah) LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?