Harrison v. Unum Group
Plaintiff: William Randall Harrison
Defendant: Unum Group, Provident Life & Accident Ins. Company and Unum Life Ins. Co. of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01649
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended and Restated Complaint against All Defendants, filed by William Randall Harrison.(Mauzy, Jane)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/25/2019. (KAM)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE-Telephone conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:15am is CANCELLED. (AKD)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19 CV 1649 RDP on all subsequent pleadings.(AKD)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/28/2019. (KEK)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than December 6, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after December 6, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on November 21, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/28/2019. (KEK)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Unum Group.(Johnson, John)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by October 23, 2019. The previously-entered order to show cause, (doc. 3), is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 10/18/2019. (CDG)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading Motion is RIPE 10/18/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Unum Group. (Johnson, John)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/18/2019. (AKD)
October 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3453580 (ALND receipt# B4601101209). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Unum Group from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-CV-2019-903913.00 filed by Unum Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(AKD). (Johnson, John) Modified on 10/10/2019 (AKD, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Regarding Consent to a Magistrate Judge in a civil action. (AKD)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Unum Group from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-CV-2019-903913.00 filed by Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Unum Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: John S Johnson
Represented By: Henry Tonsmeire Morrissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life & Accident Ins. Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Ins. Co. of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Randall Harrison
Represented By: Michael K Beard
Represented By: Jane F Mauzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?