Ohio Security Insurance Company et al v. Superior Land Designs LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company and Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Cahaba Outfitters LLC, Colonial Pipeline Co Inc, Superior Land Designs LLC, Donna Wright, Timothy Webster, Shelby Investments LLC, Cherry Gentry, Brooke Carter, Hugh Gerald Delaughder, Patsy Ann Whatley, Brent Carter, Kay White, Beverly Kay Willingham and Doug Wright
Case Number: 2:2019cv01656
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan F Winn, III on behalf of Superior Land Designs LLC (Winn, Harlan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Superior Land Designs LLC.(Plant, Adam)
December 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney by Cahaba Outfitters LLC, Shelby Investments LLC, Timothy Webster. (Windsor, Alyse) Modified on 12/3/2019 (YMB).
November 29, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colonial Pipeline Co Inc. filed by Colonial Pipeline Co Inc (Mathis, Alan)
November 29, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Colonial Pipeline Co Inc.(Mathis, Alan)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorneys James S. Williams' and Alyse Nicole Windsor's motion to withdraw as counsel of record in this action. (Doc. #28 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/26/2019. (YMB)
November 26, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cahaba Outfitters LLC, Shelby Investments LLC, Timothy Webster. (Williams, James)
November 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by R Brent Irby on behalf of Cahaba Outfitters LLC, Shelby Investments LLC, Timothy Webster (Irby, R)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Hoaglund on behalf of Cahaba Outfitters LLC, Shelby Investments LLC, Timothy Webster (Hoaglund, Eric)
November 26, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A McCallum, III on behalf of Cahaba Outfitters LLC, Shelby Investments LLC, Timothy Webster (McCallum, Charles)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Alan D. Mathis' motions to admit Laura T. Wagner, Lawrence J. Bracken, II, and Michael S. Levine pro hac vice in this action. (Docs. #20 , #21 , #22 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/25/2019. (YMB)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L Crunk on behalf of Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company (Crunk, Michelle)
November 25, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3484200 (ALND B4601102250). (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 11/25/2019 (KEK).
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael S. Levine by Colonial Pipeline Co Inc. (Mathis, Alan)
November 25, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3484195 (ALND B4601102249). (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 11/25/2019 (KEK).
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lawrence J. Bracken, II by Colonial Pipeline Co Inc. (Mathis, Alan)
November 25, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3484183 (ALND B4601102248). (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 11/25/2019 (KEK).
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura T. Wagner by Colonial Pipeline Co Inc. (Mathis, Alan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Beverly Kay Willingham. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Ohio Security Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company as to Beverly Kay Willingham. (KEK)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ohio Security Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. Colonial Pipeline Co Inc served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/28/2019. (KEK)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Answer to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Defendants Timothy Webster, Shelby Investments, LLC, and Cahaba Outfitters, LLC by Cahaba Outfitters LLC, Shelby Investments LLC, Timothy Webster.(Williams, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Colonial Pipeline Co Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ohio Security Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. Colonial Pipeline Co Inc served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (KEK)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ohio Security Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. Brent Carter served (no date on green card); Brooke Carter served (no date on green card); Cherry Gentry served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019; Kay White served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (KEK)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Defendants, DeLaughder and Whatley's, ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Hugh Gerald Delaughder, Patsy Ann Whatley.(Cochran, Glenda)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/28/2019. (KEK)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ohio Security Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. Cahaba Outfitters LLC served (no date on green card); Hugh Gerald Delaughder served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019; Shelby Investments LLC served (no date on green card); Timothy Webster served (no date on green card); Patsy Ann Whatley served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019; Donna Wright served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019; Doug Wright served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (KEK)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Cahaba Outfitters LLC, Brent Carter, Brooke Carter, Colonial Pipeline Co Inc, Hugh Gerald Delaughder, Cherry Gentry, Shelby Investments LLC, Superior Land Designs LLC, Timothy Webster, Patsy Ann Whatley, Kay White, Beverly Kay Willingham, Donna Wright, Doug Wright. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Request for service by certified mail filed by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Dodson, John)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney John W. Dodson's motions to admit Seth V. Jackson, Jocelyn Cubbon Demars, and James V. Chin pro hac vice in this action. (Docs. #4 , #5 , and #6 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/18/2019. (YMB)
October 18, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3459442. (Dodson, John)
October 18, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3459435. (Dodson, John)
October 18, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3459430. (Dodson, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Dodson, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Dodson, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Dodson, John)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. filed by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Dodson, John)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ohio Security Insurance Company. filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company (Dodson, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3453805 (ALND B4601101217) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Cahaba Outfitters LLC, Brent Carter, Brooke Carter, Colonial Pipeline Co Inc, Hugh Gerald Delaughder, Cherry Gentry, Shelby Investments LLC, Superior Land Designs LLC, Timothy Webster, Patsy Ann Whatley, Kay White, Beverly Kay Willingham, Donna Wright, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(KEK). (Dodson, John) Modified on 10/11/2019 (KEK).
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cahaba Outfitters LLC, Brent Carter, Brooke Carter, Colonial Pipeline Co Inc, Hugh Gerald Delaughder, Cherry Gentry, Shelby Investments LLC, Superior Land Designs LLC, Timothy Webster, Patsy Ann Whatley, Kay White, Beverly Kay Willingham, Donna Wright, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Company et al v. Superior Land Designs LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cahaba Outfitters LLC
Represented By: Alyse Nicole Windsor
Represented By: Eric D Hoaglund
Represented By: R Brent Irby
Represented By: Charles A McCallum, III
Represented By: James S Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Pipeline Co Inc
Represented By: Lawrence J Bracken, II
Represented By: Michael S Levine
Represented By: Laura T Wagner
Represented By: Alan D Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Land Designs LLC
Represented By: Adam P Plant
Represented By: Harlan F Winn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Webster
Represented By: Alyse Nicole Windsor
Represented By: Eric D Hoaglund
Represented By: R Brent Irby
Represented By: Charles A McCallum, III
Represented By: James S Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Investments LLC
Represented By: Alyse Nicole Windsor
Represented By: Eric D Hoaglund
Represented By: R Brent Irby
Represented By: Charles A McCallum, III
Represented By: James S Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Gerald Delaughder
Represented By: Glenda G Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy Ann Whatley
Represented By: Glenda G Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Kay Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: John W Dodson
Represented By: Jocelyn Cubbon Demars
Represented By: Seth V Jackson
Represented By: Michelle L Crunk
Represented By: James V Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John W Dodson
Represented By: Jocelyn Cubbon Demars
Represented By: Seth V Jackson
Represented By: Michelle L Crunk
Represented By: James V Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?