McWane, Inc. v. Water Works, Inc.
Petitioner: McWane, Inc.
Respondent: Water Works, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01670
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Expedited Status Conference #10 and Unopposed Motion to Continue Default Briefing Schedule in Light of Motion for Expedited Status Conference #11 . The court held a Status Conference on November 14, 2019, and as a result, the parties filed a Joint Status Report requesting a stay for 90 days. Therefore, Plaintiffs Motions #10 , #11 are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/9/2019. (KAM)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay #5 . A status conference was held on November 14, 2019. As a result of the discussions during the conference, and after reviewing the parties Joint Status Report filed on November 26, 2019, the court stayed the case on November 26, 2019. The stay is in effect pending the parties follow-up Joint Status Report, due February 24, 2020. Therefore, the Defendants Motion to Dismiss #5 is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. Defendant may re-file its Motion if deemed appropriate. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/9/2019. (KAM)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on the parties Updated Joint Status Report #17 . The parties jointly request that this case be stayed for ninety (90) days. For good cause shown, the request is GRANTED. This case SHALL be stayed for 90 days. On or before February 24, 2020, the parties SHALL submit another updated joint report informing the court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/26/2019. (KAM)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by McWane, Inc.. filed by McWane, Inc. (McDaniel, James)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the Court on the parties' #15 Joint Status Report and Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the #15 Motion is GRANTED. The parties SHALL file an updated Joint Status Report on or before November 26, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/20/2019. (JLC)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by McWane, Inc.. filed by McWane, Inc. (McDaniel, James)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER-The court conducted a telephone conference to discuss the status of this case. Following these discussions, the court DIRECTS the parties to file a Joint Status Report on or before Tuesday, November 19, 2019. The Joint Status Report SHALL contain information regarding any discovery the parties may need to answer factual questions concerning the alleged agreement between the parties. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/15/2019. (KAM)
November 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 11/14/2019. The parties shall submit a joint status report on 11/19/2019 on the issues as discussed at the hearing. (KLL)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Unopposed MOTION for Expedited Status Conference filed by Water Works, Inc.. (Jackson, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDERThis case is SET for a telephone conference on Thursday, November 14, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. The parties are DIRECTED to dial 866.434.5269. The access code is 6022965. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/12/2019. (KAM)
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFAULT BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN LIGHT OF MOTION FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE by McWane, Inc.. (McDaniel, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Expedited Status Conference by McWane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Requesting Hearing, #2 Exhibit B - Business Entity Records - Alabama Secretary of State)(McDaniel, James)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/6/2019. (KAM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Water Works, Inc.. filed by Water Works, Inc. (Jackson, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre hereby RECUSES herself from further participation in this action. This case is hereby reassigned to Judge R David Proctor for all further proceedings. Please use case number 2:19-CV-1670-RDP on all future pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/5/2019. (JLC)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Evidentiary Material re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kennedy Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Westlaw Company Investigator Family Tree for McWane Inc., #3 Exhibit C - McWane Answer to 3rd-Party Complaint and Req for Stay, #4 Exhibit D - McWane Motion to Stay Pending Ruling on Petition to Compel Arbitration, #5 Exhibit E - Water Works Opposition to Motion to Stay or Compel Arbitration)(Jackson, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay by Water Works, Inc.. (Jackson, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McWane, Inc.. Water Works, Inc. served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (McDaniel, James)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Water Works, Inc., returned to Plaintiff for service on this the 11th day of October, 2019. (JLC)
October 11, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3455380, NDAL receipt #B4601101267.(McDaniel, James) Modified on 10/11/2019 (JLC).
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McWane, Inc.. filed by McWane, Inc. (McDaniel, James)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (PETITION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL ARBITRATION) against Water Works, Inc., filed by McWane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A 1, #3 Exhibit A 2, #4 Exhibit A 3, #5 Exhibit A 4, #6 Exhibit A 5, #7 Exhibit A 6, #8 Exhibit A 7, #9 Exhibit A 8, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McWane, Inc. v. Water Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: McWane, Inc.
Represented By: James Conrad Lester
Represented By: James Ethan McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Water Works, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?