Dill v. Total Skin and Beauty Dermatology et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Gail Dill
Defendant: Total Skin and Beauty Dermatology, Jennifer Cork and Christy Hulsey
Case Number: 2:2019cv01724
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT - Accordingly, the court ORDERS Ms. Dill to amend her complaint to correct the deficiencies identified below. Ms. Dill must file her amended complaint on or before January 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/20/2019. (KEK)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BRIEFING SCHEDULE ORDER - This matter comes before the court on the Motion to Dismiss (doc. #7 ) filed December 13, 2019. Response to the motion is due on or before January 8, 2020. Reply is due on or before January 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/18/2019. (KEK)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total Skin and Beauty Dermatology. filed by Total Skin and Beauty Dermatology (Bullock, Susan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Total Skin and Beauty Dermatology. (Bullock, Susan) Modified on 12/16/2019 (KEK).
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenda Gail Dill. Total Skin and Beauty Dermatology served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (KEK)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Total Skin and Beauty Dermatology. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The court reminds Ms. Dill that she is responsible for service of the summons and complaint on the defendants in this case. Accordingly, Ms. Dill shall serve the Defendants on or before January 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/18/2019. (KEK)
November 4, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601101760. (KEK)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 - On or before November 12, 2019, Ms. Dill may file an amended affidavit in support of her motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $400.00. If Ms. Dill chooses to file an amended affidavit, Ms. Dill shall completely answer each question asked. If Ms. Dill does not comply with this order, then the court may dismiss this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/28/2019. (KEK)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brenda Gail Dill. (KEK)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Cork, Christy Hulsey, Total Skin and Beauty Dermatology, filed by Brenda Gail Dill.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dill v. Total Skin and Beauty Dermatology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Skin and Beauty Dermatology
Represented By: Susan W Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Cork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Hulsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Gail Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?