Resto v. Barclays Bank Delaware et al
Plaintiff: Luis Resto
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union LLC and Barclays Bank Delaware
Case Number: 2:2019cv01750
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Barclays Bank Delaware.(Moore, Miya)
December 16, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Reid, Kirkland)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Barclays Bank Delaware has filed an unopposed motion seeking a twenty-one day extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #15 ). The motion is GRANTED. The moving defendant shall file its response to the complaint on or before December 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/2/19. (MRR, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barclays Bank Delaware. filed by Barclays Bank Delaware (Moore, Miya)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 11/26/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. (Moore, Miya)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Inc. filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc (Young, L)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Young, L)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC. filed by Trans Union LLC (Robinett, Matthew)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Robinett, Matthew)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, has filed an unopposed motion for a 21-day extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #8 ). The motion is GRANTED. Equifax shall file its response on or before December 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/21/19. (MRR, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC. filed by Equifax Information Services LLC (Reid, Kirkland)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion is RIPE 11/20/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Reid, Kirkland)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Barclays Bank Delaware served (no date entered on green card) (MRR, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Equifax Information Services LLC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (MRR, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Experian Information Solutions Inc served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (MRR, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Luis Resto. (Adkins, Micah)
October 25, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3465408 (B4601101622). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luis Resto.(MRR, ). (Adkins, Micah) Modified on 10/28/2019 (MRR, ).
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luis Resto.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resto v. Barclays Bank Delaware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Resto
Represented By: Micah S Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Kirkland E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: L Jackson Young, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Matthew Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Represented By: Miya Angele Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?