Patterson v. Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The
Plaintiff: Scott E Patterson
Defendant: Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv01795
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:20109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER governing further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown: Discovery due by 10/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2020; Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/1/20. (SAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Graham, John)
December 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/8/19. (SAC)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The. filed by Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The (Graham, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The.(Graham, John)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott E Patterson. Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (KEK)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
November 7, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601101900. (KEK)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Scott E Patterson. (Wettermark, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The, filed by Scott E Patterson.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott E Patterson
Represented By: James H Wettermark
Represented By: William C Tucker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company, The
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: John M Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?