Hughes v. Wells Fargo NA et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery T Hughes
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc and Wells Fargo NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv01810
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Jeffery T Hughes. (Lay, Kenneth) Modified text to reflect title of document and event to reflect motion on 12/27/2019 (MRR, ).
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER- Before the court is the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pltf Jeffery T. Hughes and Deft Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Doc. #11 ); Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the claims against deft Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/12/19. (MRR, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Jeffery T Hughes (Rummage, Ryan) Modified text and added filer on 12/5/2019 (MRR, ).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is Defendants' #5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before 12/23/2019, and Defendants may file a reply on or before 1/08/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 12/05/2019. (KMAW)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/5/19. (MRR, )
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference set for 10:00 a.m. on December 11, 2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 12/05/2019. (KMAW)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than December 27, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after December 27, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on December 11, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 11/12/19. (MRR, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Wells Fargo NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit 2 - Note)(Rummage, Ryan)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The #3 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 11/12/2019. (KMAW)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Wells Fargo NA. (Rummage, Ryan)
November 6, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3473800 (B4601101901). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Wells Fargo NA from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 68-cv-2019-900851., filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Wells Fargo NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Rummage, Ryan) Modified on 11/7/2019 (MRR, ).
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Wells Fargo NA from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 68-cv-2019-900851., filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Wells Fargo NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Wells Fargo NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo NA
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery T Hughes
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?