Jones et al v. Jefferson County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Greater Birmingham Ministries, Traci Jones and Robert Sellers
Defendant: Jefferson County Board of Education and Alan King
Case Number: 2:2019cv01821
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - After examining the complaint and the materials relating to the parties' proposed order, the Court is satisfied that the parties' proposed order is a fair and reasonable resolution of the plaintiffs' claims. Therefore, the Court adopts the following agreed findings of fact: (see order for agreed findings of fact). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/16/2019. (KEK)
December 12, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jefferson County Board of Education, Alan King, filed by Traci Jones, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Robert Sellers.(KEK)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting (18) Motion for Leave to File in case 2:19-cv-01821-MHH. The Court grants the plaintiffs' unopposed motion to amend the complaint to add an additional plaintiff. The Court asks the Clerk to please file as the operative complaint exhibit 1 to the motion to amend. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on December 12, 2019. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-01821-MHH, 2:65-cv-00396-MHH(Haikala, Madeline)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Traci Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:65-cv-00396-MHH, 2:19-cv-01821-MHH(Ross, Deuel)
December 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala: Telephone Conference held on 12/12/2019. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (YMB)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER; By email dated December 10, 2019, the parties requested a Status Conference. For good cause shown, the Court SETS this case for a Telephone Conference at 4:00 p.m. Central on December 12, 2019. Counsel of record shall please dial 877-810-9415 and enter access code 5036215 to participate in the call. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/12/2019. (JLC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support re (1210 in 2:65-cv-00396-MHH) MOTION for Attorney Fees CORRECTED, (1206 in 2:65-cv-00396-MHH) First MOTION to Amend/Correct (1205) MOTION for Attorney Fees , (1205 in 2:65-cv-00396-MHH) MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alfornia Carter, Catrena Carter, Lonnell Carter, Sandra Ray, Alene Reeves, Ricky Reeves, Linda Stout. Associated Cases: 2:65-cv-00396-MHH, 2:19-cv-01821-MHH(Jones Herbert, GeDa')
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION re: 1261 - For good cause shown, the Court grants the motion. On future filings, the parties shall please include both cases numbers in the caption but electronically file in case no. 2:65-cv-00396-MHH only. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/22/2019. Associated Cases: 2:65-cv-00396-MHH, 2:19-cv-01821-MHH(KEK)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 Case reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. (KEK)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER re #12 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Greater Birmingham Ministries, Traci Jones. The parties are DIRECTED to file a copy of the motion in Case No. 2:65-cv-00396. Once the parties have done so, the Clerk is DIRECTED to consolidate this case with Case No. 2:65-cv-00396. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/20/2019. (CDG)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Greater Birmingham Ministries, Traci Jones. (Ross, Deuel)
November 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 11/18/2019. (BST, )
November 12, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3477094 (ALND reciept# B4601102018). (Lin-Luse, Monique) Modified on 11/13/2019 (AKD, ).
November 12, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3477084 (ALND reciept# B4601102017). (Aden, Leah) Modified on 11/13/2019 (AKD).
November 12, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3477079 (ALND receipt# B4601102016). (Ross, Deuel) Modified on 11/13/2019 (AKD).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f).Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/12/2019. (AKD )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 25, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 25, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for November 18, 2019 at 10:00 am. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/12/2019. (AKD)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Motion is RIPE 11/8/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Greater Birmingham Ministries, Traci Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Order, #2 Exhibit B - Jefferson County Board of Education Recommendation, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Baodong Liu, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of William S. Cooper)(Ross, Deuel)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorneys Deuel Ross, Leah Aden and Monique Lin-Luse, but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/8/2019. (AVC)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Traci Jones, Greater Birmingham Ministries. Alan King waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Jackson, Sidney)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Traci Jones, Greater Birmingham Ministries. Jefferson County Board of Education waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Jackson, Sidney)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Deuel Ross, Leah Aden and Monique Lin-Luse by Greater Birmingham Ministries, Traci Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Serve as Local Counsel, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Deuel Ross, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Leah C. Aden, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Monique Lin-Luse, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Sidney)
November 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3475482 (ALND receipt# B4601101969). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Alan King, Jefferson County Board of Education, filed by Alan King, Jefferson County Board of Education.(AKD). (Jackson, Sidney) Modified on 11/8/2019 (AKD, ).
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Whit Colvin on behalf of Jefferson County Board of Education (Colvin, Whit)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore A Lawson, II on behalf of Alan King (Lawson, Theodore)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to a Magistrate Judge in a civil action. (AKD)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alan King, Jefferson County Board of Education, filed by Alan King, Jefferson County Board of Education.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Jefferson County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Birmingham Ministries
Represented By: Sidney Monroe Jackson
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Leah C Aden
Represented By: Monique Lin-Luse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Jones
Represented By: Sidney Monroe Jackson
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Leah C Aden
Represented By: Monique Lin-Luse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sellers
Represented By: Sidney Monroe Jackson
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Leah C Aden
Represented By: Monique Lin-Luse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Board of Education
Represented By: Whit Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan King
Represented By: Theodore A Lawson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?