Womack v. US Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Womack
Defendant: US Bank National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Seterus Inc and New Rez LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01824
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by New Rez LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, US Bank National Association.(Premo, Grant)
December 30, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Leavens, Ginny)
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Amanda Womack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Note)(Lay, Kenneth)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Plaintiff is directed to file the amended complaint by Monday, December 16, 2019. Further, Defendants' responses to the amended complaint remain due within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 12/13/2019. (LAS2)
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend complaint by Amanda Womack. (Lay, Kenneth)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Before this Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. #13 The motion is hereby GRANTED, and Plaintiff is directed to file the amended complaint by Monday, December 9, 2019. Further, Defendants' responses to the amended complaint are due within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the amended complaint. Accordingly, Defendants Nationstar, U.S. Bank, and Shellpoint's Motion for Extension of Time #16 is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 12/5/2019. (PSM)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER This Court acknowledges receipt of the Joint Stipulation of Pro Tanto Dismissal #14 filed on December 4, 2019. Accordingly, all claims against Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant MERS as a defendant in this action. Plaintiff has reserved the right to proceed against the remaining Defendants, and her claims against the other Defendants remain pending. Because Defendant MERS has been dismissed from this action, its Motion to Dismiss #9 is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 12/5/2019. (PSM)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 12/4/2019. (PSM)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Bundrick, Lawrence)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Leavens, Ginny)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (Gerhardt, Graham)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Amanda Womack. (Lay, Kenneth)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amanda Womack. (Lay, Kenneth)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable L. Scott Coogler. Please use case number 2:19 CV 1824 LSC on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline for #9 Motion to Dismiss. Any opposition to the motion must be filed by December 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/14/2019. (CLS2)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gerhardt, Graham)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' responsive pleading(s) must be filed by December 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/13/2019. (CLS2)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 11/13/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by New Rez LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, US Bank National Association. (Premo, Grant)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC's responsive pleading is due December 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/12/2019. (CLS2)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 11/12/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Leavens, Ginny)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Leavens, Ginny)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Gerhardt, Graham)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (AKD)
November 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3475630 (ALND receipt# B4601101970). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by US Bank National Association, New Rez LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 68-CV-2019-900856. filed by US Bank National Association, New Rez LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(AKD) Modified on 11/8/2019 (AKD).. (Premo, Grant) Modified on 11/12/2019 (AKD, ).
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by US Bank National Association, New Rez LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 68-CV-2019-900856. filed by US Bank National Association, New Rez LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AKD) Modified on 11/8/2019 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Womack v. US Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Grant A Premo
Represented By: Hallman B Eady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Graham W Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Grant A Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Michael Paul Taunton
Represented By: Ginny Willcox Leavens
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: Lawrence Hugh Bundrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Rez LLC
Represented By: Grant A Premo
Represented By: Hallman B Eady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Womack
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?