Farley v. Tarrant, City of et al
Plaintiff: Sonya Lynn Farley
Defendant: Dennis Reno, Matthew Voss, Phillip George, Jonathan Page and Tarrant, City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv01845
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time. (Doc. #8 ). Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before January 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/10/2019. (YMB)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Phillip George, Jonathan Page, Dennis Reno, Tarrant, City of, Matthew Voss. (Sides, Terry)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry A Sides on behalf of Phillip George, Jonathan Page, Dennis Reno, Tarrant, City of, Matthew Voss (Sides, Terry)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonya Lynn Farley. Phillip George served (no date on green card); Jonathan Page served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019; Matthew Voss served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (KEK) Modified on 11/27/2019 (KEK).
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonya Lynn Farley. Dennis Reno served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019; Tarrant, City of served (no date on green card). (KEK)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Phillip George, Jonathan Page, Dennis Reno, Tarrant, City of, Matthew Voss. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/14/2019. (KEK)
November 13, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3478051 (ALND B4601102055) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Phillip George, Jonathan Page, Dennis Reno, Tarrant, City of, Matthew Voss, filed by Sonya Lynn Farley.(KEK). (Wright, Joshua) Modified on 11/14/2019 (KEK).
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Sonya Lynn Farley. (KEK)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phillip George, Jonathan Page, Dennis Reno, Tarrant, City of, Matthew Voss, filed by Sonya Lynn Farley.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farley v. Tarrant, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Reno
Represented By: Terry A Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Voss
Represented By: Terry A Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip George
Represented By: Terry A Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Page
Represented By: Terry A Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarrant, City of
Represented By: Terry A Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Lynn Farley
Represented By: Joshua W Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?