Cullman Primary Care PC v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Cullman Primary Care PC
Defendant: Seema Verma, Palmetto GBA LLC and Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv01893
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Court stays the briefing schedule (Doc. 9 ) to allow the parties to negotiate a settlement. On or before January 23, 2020, the parties shall please file a joint status report informing the Court of a resolution or proposing a new briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/23/2019. (KEK)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule by Cullman Primary Care PC. (Davis, Richard)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the parties Joint Motion for Entry of Briefing Schedule. (Doc. #8 ). Plaintiff shall file its brief in support of its motion for a preliminary injunction on or before 1/6/2020; defendants shall file their brief(s) in opposition on or before 1/16/2020; plaintiff may file a reply brief(s) on or before 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/18/2019. (YMB)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Entry of Briefing Schedule by Alex M Azar, II, Seema Verma. (Long, Don)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to all defendants by Cullman Primary Care PC. (KEK)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Don B Long, III on behalf of Alex M Azar, II, Seema Verma (Long, Don)
November 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala: Hearing re Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (doc. #1 ) held on 11/21/2019. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (YMB)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, II, Palmetto GBA LLC, Seema Verma. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
November 21, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601102195. (KEK)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by Cullman Primary Care PC. (KEK)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Relief from the Security Requirement of Federal Rule 65(c) by Cullman Primary Care PC. (KEK)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Cullman Primary Care PC. (KEK)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Cullman Primary Care PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cullman Primary Care PC v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto GBA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cullman Primary Care PC
Represented By: Richard E Davis
Represented By: William Anthony Davis, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?