Milner et al v. Team Health et al
Plaintiff: Dr Jeffrey D Milner and C & J Sciences LLC
Defendant: Team Health, Baptist Medical Center East, Baptist Health Systems, Neal Johns, St Vincent's Blount and Andalusia Health, Baptist Health System Montgomery, Southeast ER Physicians PA, Eric Morgan, Dr Jon Cuba, Mobile Infirmary, Ginger Henry, John Lewis, Andalusia Health, Baptist Medical Center South, Dr Kristi Witcher, St. Vincent's Blount, Dr Deric Jones and Prattville Baptist
Case Number: 2:2019cv02041
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kristi Witcher (no date entered on green card) (MRR, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed Neal Johns served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (MRR, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 41 Summons Returned Unexecuted with green card not attached as to Deric Jones. (MRR, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 40 Alias Summonses Issued as to Jon Cuba, Neal Johns, Deric Jones, Kristi Witcher, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 39 Alias Summons Issued as to Kristi Witcher, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER- Pltfs and deft St. Vincent's Blount have informed the court that the pltfs inadvertently included St. Vincent's in Count One of the Second Amended and Restated Complaint, which asserts a claim under the Emergency Medical Treatment & Labor Act ("EMTALA")(Doc #37 ); Accordingly, it is ORDERED that any claim under EMTALA against St. Vincents is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 2/4/20. (MRR, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION of Parties and Request for Dismissal filed by St. Vincent's Blount, Jeffrey D Milner, C & J Sciences LLC (deGruy, Tiffany) Modified text and added filers on 2/4/2020 (MRR, ).
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant St. Vincent's Blount shall file its response to the complaint on or before February 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 2/3/2020. (RCP)
February 3, 2020 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by St. Vincent's Blount. (deGruy, Tiffany)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time. The moving defendants shall file their response to the complaint on or before February 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/30/2020. (RCP)
January 30, 2020 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION For Enlargement of Time to Serve a Responsive Pleading by John Lewis, Team Health. (Hodinka, Ryan) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (MRR, ).
January 29, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed Deric Jones served (no date on green card)(MRR, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mobile Infirmary served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (MRR, )
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time. The moving defendants shall file their response to the complaint on or before February 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/27/2020. (RCP)
January 27, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Baptist Health System Montgomery, Baptist Medical Center East, Baptist Medical Center South. (Joseph, Anthony)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF DISMISSAL- Pltfs filed notices of dismissal, seeking voluntarily dismiss without prejudice their claims against deft Mobile Infirmary (Docs #26 & #27 ); It is ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED, and all claims against Mobile Infirmary are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/27/20. (MRR, )
January 26, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Mobile Infirmary, Only by C & J Sciences LLC. (Loder, Lee)
January 26, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Mobile Infirmary, Only by Jeffrey D Milner. (Loder, Lee)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve A Responsive Pleading. Defendant Team Health and Defendant John Lewis are ORDERED to file their responsive pleading on or before 1/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/17/2020. (KMAW)
January 16, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve a Responsive Pleading by John Lewis, Team Health. (Hodinka, Ryan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Eric Morgan. (MRR, )
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant Andalusia Health is ORDERED to file its responsive pleading on or before 2/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/15/2020. (KMAW)
January 15, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Andalusia Health. (Lancaster, Loren)
January 13, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Prattville Baptist. (MRR, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Kristi Witcher. (MRR, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Ginger Henry. (MRR, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Baptist Medical Center East. (MRR, )
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Defendant St. Vincent's Blount. The moving defendant shall file its response to the Second Amended and Restated Complaint on or before February 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/10/2020. (RCP)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by St. Vincent's Blount. (deGruy, Tiffany)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Baptist Health Systems served (no date on green card); Baptist Medical Center East served (no date on green card) (MRR, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Baptist Health System Montgomery served (no date on green card); Baptist Medical Center South served (no date on green card) (MRR, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andalusia Health served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020; Neal Johns served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (MRR, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jon Cuba served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020; John Lewis served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020; Team Health served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (MRR, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed St. Vincent's Blount served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (MRR, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ginger Henry, Deric Jones, St. Vincent's Blount, Kristi Witcher, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jon Cuba, Neal Johns, John Lewis, Eric Morgan, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Baptist Health Systems, Baptist Medical Center East, Baptist Medical Center South, Prattville Baptist, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andalusia Health, Baptist Health System Montgomery, Mobile Infirmary, Team Health, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
December 19, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3500632 (B4601102841). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by C & J Sciences LLC, Jeffrey D Milner.(MRR, ). (Loder, Lee) Modified on 12/20/2019 (MRR, ).
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jeffrey D Milner. (Loder, Lee)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Restated Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey D Milner C & J Sciences LLC.(Loder, Lee) Modified text and added filer on 12/19/2019 (MRR, ).
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED & Restated COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey D Milner, C & J Sciences LLC(Loder, Lee) Modified text and added filer on 12/19/2019 (MRR, ).
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by C & J Sciences LLC, Jeffrey D Milner.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milner et al v. Team Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Health
Represented By: Ryan M Hodinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Medical Center East
Represented By: Thomas W H Buck, Jr
Represented By: Anthony A Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Vincent's Blount and Andalusia Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health System Montgomery
Represented By: Thomas W H Buck, Jr
Represented By: Anthony A Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast ER Physicians PA
Represented By: Ryan M Hodinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Jon Cuba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Infirmary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lewis
Represented By: Ryan M Hodinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andalusia Health
Represented By: Loren M Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Medical Center South
Represented By: Thomas W H Buck, Jr
Represented By: Anthony A Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Kristi Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Vincent's Blount
Represented By: Tiffany J deGruy
Represented By: James Bradley Robertson
Represented By: Thomas Brooks Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Deric Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prattville Baptist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Jeffrey D Milner
Represented By: Lee W Loder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C & J Sciences LLC
Represented By: Lee W Loder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?