Pickard v. Serra Mazda et al
Plaintiff: William M Pickard, III
Defendant: T Dwayne Currier, Jerry Cheng, Roberto Rodriguez, Steve Serra, Barry Brown, Steve Serra Auto Group, Serra Toyota and Serra Mazda
Case Number: 2:2019cv02119
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs response to the motion to dismiss is due by March 5, 2020. Defendants reply, if any, is due by March 12, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 02/20/2020. (AKD)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Barry Brown, Jerry Cheng, T Dwayne Currier, Roberto Rodriguez, Steve Serra, Serra Mazda, Serra Toyota, Steve Serra Auto Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William M Pickard, III. Steve Serra served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/22/2020. (AKD)
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William M Pickard, III. Steve Serra Auto Group served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020 (no date on greencard). (AKD)
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William M Pickard, III. Barry Brown served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/22/2020; Jerry Cheng served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/22/2020; T Dwayne Currier served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/22/2020; Roberto Rodriguez served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/22/2020; Serra Mazda served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/22/2020; Serra Toyota served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/22/2020. (AKD)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Barry Brown, Jerry Cheng, T Dwayne Currier, Roberto Rodriguez, Steve Serra, Serra Mazda, Serra Toyota, Steve Serra Auto Group delivered to USM with 285 forms. (AKD)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER As the Plaintiff has submitted an amended complaint consistent with the undersigneds previous orders, (docs. 4, 6 & 8), the Clerk is DIRECTED to serve the Third Amended Complaint, (doc. 9) on Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 01/27/2020. (AKD)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barry Brown, Jerry Cheng, T Dwayne Currier, Roberto Rodriguez, Steve Serra, Serra Mazda, Serra Toyota, Steve Serra Auto Group, filed by William M Pickard, III.(AKD)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff has now filed a second amended complaint, again with allegations identical to those in the previous two complaints. (Doc. 7).If Plaintiff does not intend to include factual allegations against the business entity Serra Toyota, he should omit Serra Toyota as a defendant in this action. Plaintiffs amended complaint is due by January 29, 2020.Failure to file an amended complaint within the time prescribed may result in the dismissal of all claims for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 01/15/2020. (AKD)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barry Brown, Jerry Cheng, T Dwayne Currier, Roberto Rodriguez, Steve Serra, Serra Mazda, Serra Toyota, Steve Serra Auto Group, filed by William M Pickard, III.(AKD)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Plaintiff has now filed an amended complaint, (doc. 5), but its factual allegations are identical to those in the original complaint. It still contains no facts that would support Defendant Serra Toyotas liability for any of the claims Plaintiff asserts. Plaintiff is again ORDERED to file an amended complaint that complies with the previous order. Plaintiffs amended complaint is due by January 20, 2020. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time prescribed may result in the dismissal of all claims for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 01/02/2020. (AKD)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barry Brown, Jerry Cheng, T Dwayne Currier, Roberto Rodriguez, Steve Serra, Serra Mazda, Serra Toyota, Steve Serra Auto Group, filed by William M Pickard, III.(AKD) Modified on 1/2/2020 (AKD, ).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Upon review of the motion and accompanying affidavit, the undersigned finds the plaintiff is indigent, and the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. For these reasons, the plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint bearing this case number (2:19-cv-02119-JHE) on the first page within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/30/2019. (KEK)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a Magistrate Judge in civil action. (AKD)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 12/27/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by William M Pickard, III. (AKD)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barry Brown, Jerry Cheng, T Dwayne Currier, Roberto Rodriguez, Steve Serra, Serra Mazda, Serra Toyota, Steve Serra Auto Group, filed by William M Pickard, III.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickard v. Serra Mazda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Dwayne Currier
Represented By: Robert Bret Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Cheng
Represented By: Robert Bret Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert Bret Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Serra
Represented By: Robert Bret Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Brown
Represented By: Robert Bret Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Serra Auto Group
Represented By: Robert Bret Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serra Toyota
Represented By: Robert Bret Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serra Mazda
Represented By: Robert Bret Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M Pickard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?