Differ v. Diveley et al
Plaintiff: Dennis John Differ
Defendant: Ms Kathleen R Dively, Ms Michelle Robinson and Kathleen R Diveley
Case Number: 2:2020cv00161
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISMISSAL ORDER - The undersigned construes Mr. Differ's motion to dismiss as a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Doc. #6 ). Thus construed, the court ORDERS that all claims asserted in this matter are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Mr. Differ's right to pursue his claims in state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/6/2020. (KEK)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Dennis John Differ. (MRR, )
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Pltf's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED to the extent he seeks leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee; Pltf's motion to appoint an attorney is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to refrain from serving any deft with process until specifically directed to do so; Pltf is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days: (1) why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of federal jurisdiction, why the claims against the Unnamed Dentist should not be dismissed as untimely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/19/20. (MRR, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail Doc 3 and pro se electronic noticing from sent to Dennis John Differ (MRR, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction by Dennis John Differ (MRR, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion is RIPE 2/4/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed, by Dennis John Differ. (MRR, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dennis John Differ.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Differ v. Diveley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Kathleen R Dively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Michelle Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen R Diveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis John Differ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?