City of Leeds, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Plaintiff: City of Leeds, Alabama
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Pharma Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Actavis LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Purdue Pharma Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma L P, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Noramco Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00201
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Leeds, Alabama. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (AKD)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by City of Leeds, Alabama as to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc. (AKD)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Leeds, Alabama. Endo Health Solutions Inc served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (AKD)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Leeds, Alabama. Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020 (green card signed but not dated). (AKD)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Leeds, Alabama. Actavis LLC served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Cephalon Inc served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Johnson & Johnson served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (AKD)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Leeds, Alabama. Cardinal Health Inc served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/21/2020; Watson Laboratories Inc served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (AKD)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Leeds, Alabama. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; McKesson Corporation served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Noramco Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Purdue Pharma L P served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (AKD)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Ohio Northern for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Ohio Northern. (KEK)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Actavis Pharma Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (MRR, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc.mailed certified mail. (AKD, )
February 14, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3536349 (ALND reciept# B4601104113). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc, filed by City of Leeds, Alabama.(AKD). (Sutton, William) Modified on 2/14/2020 (AKD).
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Consent to a Magistrate Judge in a civil action. (AKD)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by City of Leeds, Alabama. (AKD)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by City of Leeds, Alabama (AKD)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc, filed by City of Leeds, Alabama.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Leeds, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Leeds, Alabama
Represented By: Jere L Beasley
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Represented By: Richard D Stratton
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Rhon E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?