Owens v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alisicia Owens
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00290
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE after having received Plaintiff's #2 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the FRCP. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/31/2020. (JLC)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff''s Voluntary Dismissal by Alisicia Owens. (Roy, Douglas)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/6/2020. (KSS)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL; A Rule 26 Meeting Report is due by May 4, 2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for August 4, 2021, at 10:15 a.m. and for a Jury Trial set for Tuesday, September 7, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. BOTH in Birmingham, Alabama, at the Hugo L. Black, U. S. Federal Courthouse before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/4/2020. (JLC)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company. filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Bazemore, Thomas)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company.(Bazemore, Thomas)
March 3, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3549291, NDAL receipt #B4601104514. (Bazemore, Thomas) Modified on 3/4/2020 (JLC).
March 3, 2020 COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, filed by Alisicia Owens. (Deemed filed 2/10/2020 in the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, attached to the Notice of Removal as Exhibit A).(JLC)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2020-900536.00., filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisicia Owens
Represented By: Douglas M Roy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas E Bazemore, III
Represented By: Gordon J Brady, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?