Maldonado v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cherie Nickole Maldonado
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00490
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Defendants Notice of Filing Declaration in Compliance with Court Order #11 . M. Tae Phillips was inadvertently named in the courts prior order conditionally granting admission pro hac vice 10 . Attorney Russell S. Buhite was the proper applicant seeking admission pro hac vice. As such, Defendants Motion #11 is GRANTED, and Attorney Buhite is given leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/1/2020. (KAM)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Russell S. Buhite, MOTION for Limited Admission by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Phillips, Matthew)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, filed on behalf of Attorney M. Tae Phillips #9 . For good cause shown, the Motion #9 is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. On or before May 29, 2020, Attorney Phillips SHALL certify to the court that he has read and understands (1) any local rules applicable in this District; (2) this court's CM/ECF requirements; and (3) the Alabama State Bar Pledge of Professionalism which can be accessed at http://www.alabar.org/service/Pledge.cfm. Failure to comply with this order will result in vacatur of the conditional grant of the motion. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/28/2020. (KAM)
May 27, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3597575. (Phillips, Matthew)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice or Russell S. Buhite by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, Matthew) Modified on 5/27/2020 (KAM, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Insurance Company. filed by Standard Insurance Company (Phillips, Matthew)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Phillips, Matthew)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #5 . For good cause shown, the Motion #5 is GRANTED. Defendant SHALL file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before June 9, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/26/2020. (KAM)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company. (Phillips, Matthew)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cherie Nickole Maldonado. Standard Insurance Company served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/27/2020. (KAM)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company mailed certified mail (KAM)
April 15, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3573530, NDAL receipt #B4601105416. (Burke, Peter) Modified on 4/16/2020 (JLC).
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Cherie Nickole Maldonado. (Burke, Peter)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company, filed by Cherie Nickole Maldonado.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Nickole Maldonado
Represented By: Peter H Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell Scott Buhite
Represented By: Matthew Tae Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?