Fipps v. Lester
Plaintiff: Robin Fipps and Pate & Lester Company, Inc.
Defendant: Lamar Lester
Case Number: 2:2020cv00520
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/4/20. (MRR, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (MRR, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Remand filed by Robin Fipps, Pate & Lester Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dodgen, Walter)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Lamar Lester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lamar Lester)(Hargrove, Travis) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (MRR, ).
May 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2020. (BST, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The defendant removed this case to this district court on April 16, 2020, on the basis of diversity jurisdiction, and then filed a motion to dismiss or stay the case. (Docs. #1 , #3 ). On April 29, 2020, the plaintiffs filed a motion to remand, arguing diversity jurisdiction does not exist in this case. (Doc. #6 ). On April 30, 2020, the plaintiffs filed a motion to stay their deadline to respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss, on the ground it is in the interest of judicial economy to first brief and decide the question whether this district court has subject matter jurisdiction. (Doc. #7 ). By an e-mail sent to the chambers of the undersigned, counsel for the plaintiffs has confirmed counsel for the defendant does not oppose the motion seeking a stay. For good cause shown, the plaintiffs' motion to stay (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. The defendant shall file a response to the plaintiffs' motion to remand within fourteen (14) calendar days from the entry date of this order. The plaintiffs shall file any reply within seven (7) calendar days of the date on which the defendant's response is due. If the motion to remand is denied, the undersigned will enter a new briefing schedule for the defendant's motion to dismiss or stay this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/1/20. (MRR, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 10:15 AM on Tuesday, 5/5/20; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, by 4:00 PM on Monday, 5/4/20, the conference will be cancelled. (BST)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend and/or Stay Their Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Robin Fipps, Pate & Lester Company, Inc.. (Dodgen, Walter)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Robin Fipps, Pate & Lester Company, Inc.. (Dodgen, Walter)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: On April 20, 2020, the defendant filed a motion to dismiss or stay this action. (Doc. #3 ). The plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to the motion within fourteen calendar days from the entry date of this order. The defendant shall file any reply within seven calendar days of the date on which the plaintiff's response is due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/21/20. (MRR, )
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than June 4, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after June 4, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on May 5, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/21/20. (MRR, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss or to Stay Proceedings by Lamar Lester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Georgia Complaint)(Hargrove, Travis)
April 17, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3574576 (B4601105440). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2020-901100., filed by Lamar Lester. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Hargrove, Travis) Modified on 4/17/2020 (MRR, ).
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 16, 2020 COMPLAINT against Lamar Lester, filed by Robin Fipps.- Deemed filed 3/18/20, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1)(MRR, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2020-901100., filed by Lamar Lester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fipps v. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Fipps
Represented By: S Andrew Kelly
Represented By: Walter A Dodgen, Jr
Represented By: Zachary Paul Mardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pate & Lester Company, Inc.
Represented By: S Andrew Kelly
Represented By: Walter A Dodgen, Jr
Represented By: Zachary Paul Mardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Lester
Represented By: Travis Carlisle Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?