Lederer v. NXTsoft, LLC
Plaintiff: Gene Lederer
Defendant: NXTSOFT, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00545
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L. Maze: Telephone Conference held on 6/16/2020. (SRD)
June 9, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint Doc. 10) by NXTSOFT, LLC.(Hitson, Brent)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference set for Tuesday, June 16, 2020 at 10:30 AM is hereby RESET for 2:30 PM on the same day. The call-in information previously sent to all counsel remains the same. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 6/9/2020. (SRD)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER: The Court hereby SETS a telephone status conference on Tuesday, June 16, 2020 at 10:30 AM. The Court will email call-in information to all counsel of record. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 6/8/2020. (SRD)
May 27, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, this case reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that the telephone conference set for 5/22/2020 is cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/21/2020. (BST, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Friday, 5/22/2020; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, by 4:00 PM on Thursday, 5/21/2020, the conference will be cancelled. (BST, )
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that the parties are reminded that case will be reassigned after 6/8/2020 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 5/22/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties are directed to call in as directed; if all parties submit a an executed consent before 6/8/2020, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/29/2020. (KAM)
April 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John E Ott: Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2020. (BST, )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Telephone Conference set for 4/27/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call 888-808-6929 and use access code 5917763 to participate; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/22/2020. (BST, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
April 22, 2020 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:20-cv-00010. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case to the Northern District of Alabama. Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/20/2020. (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY in support re #13 Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case filed by NXTsoft, LLC. (Metheny, K.) Modified on 4/9/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendant may have 14 days to file a reply brief which is not to exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/3/2020. (copies mailed/emailed) (AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #30 Order to show cause filed by NXTsoft, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Registration)(Hitson, Brent) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER to show cause to attorney Brent Hitson as to why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include revoking his pro hac vice status, for failure to register for CM/ECF. Show Cause Response due by 4/15/2020 Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/1/2020. (copy mailed)(AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of #13 Motion to Transfer filed by Gene Lederer. (Martin, Meagan) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by NXTsoft, LLC. (Metheny, K.) Modified on 4/1/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #25 Motion to Seal. The Defendant shall file an amended Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement which discloses the identities of all of its members on or before March 31, 2020. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/24/2020. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of #13 Motion to Transfer by NXTsoft, LLC. (Cocciolo, Rachel) Modified on 3/18/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 25 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof by NXTsoft, LLC. (Cocciolo, Rachel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 3/18/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Martin, Meagan) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case filed by Gene Lederer. (Shaughnessy, Kevin) Modified on 3/10/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 28, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney K. Bryance Metheny and Brent Hitson, appearing on behalf of NXTsoft, LLC (Filing fee $300 receipt number ORL089296.) Related document: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Brent Hitson to appear pro hac vice , #20 Unopposed MOTION for K. Bryance Metheny to appear telephonically for the purpose of preparing the case management report. (ARJ) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/25/2020. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Motion for Counsel to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Attorney K. Bryance Metheny may appear at the case management conference telephonically for the purpose of preparing the Case Management Report. Otherwise, all other counsel attending the case management conference shall attend in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/25/2020. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for K. Bryance Metheny to appear telephonically for the purpose of preparing the case management report by NXTsoft, LLC. (Cocciolo, Rachel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Brent Hitson to appear pro hac vice by NXTsoft, LLC. (Cocciolo, Rachel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for K. Bryance Metheny to appear pro hac vice by NXTsoft, LLC. (Cocciolo, Rachel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of counsel (Special Admission Attorney Certification - Brent Hitson) by Rachel Christine Cocciolo on behalf of NXTsoft, LLC (Cocciolo, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of counsel (Special Admission Attorney Certification - K. Bryance Metheny) by Rachel Christine Cocciolo on behalf of NXTsoft, LLC (Cocciolo, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by NXTsoft, LLC. Related case(s): No (Cocciolo, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by NXTsoft, LLC. (Cocciolo, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by NXTsoft, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase Agreement)(Cocciolo, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Christine Cocciolo on behalf of NXTsoft, LLC (Cocciolo, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #7 Order to Show Cause. See Doc. 10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/23/2020. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Gene Lederer with Jury Demand. filed by Gene Lederer. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Gene Lederer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement)(Martin, Meagan) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gene Lederer. Related case(s): no (Martin, Meagan) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Gene Lederer. (Martin, Meagan) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to show cause as to the Plaintiff. On or before January 22, 2020, the Plaintiff shall either show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, or file an amended complaint that contains allegations that establish that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/9/2020. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Shaughnessy on behalf of Gene Lederer (Shaughnessy, Kevin) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to NXTsoft, LLC. (RDO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/21/2020. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/6/2020. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-10-Orl-22LRH. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NXTSOFT, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16310328) filed by Gene Lederer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Employment Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Martin, Meagan) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lederer v. NXTsoft, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Lederer
Represented By: Meagan Leigh Martin
Represented By: Kevin W Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXTSOFT, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Christine Cocciolo
Represented By: K Bryance Metheny
Represented By: Brent Hitson
Represented By: Brent D Hitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?