Hinton v. United States Pipe and Foundry Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Terry L Hinton, Jr
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers and United States Pipe and Foundry Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00570
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/10/20. (MRR, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 27, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 27, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on July 6, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 866-390-1828 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 9262283. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/10/20. (MRR, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers.(Davies, George)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cortlin Lee Bond on behalf of United States Pipe and Foundry Company LLC (Bond, Cortlin)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Pipe and Foundry Company LLC. filed by United States Pipe and Foundry Company LLC (Yuengert, Anne)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States Pipe and Foundry Company LLC.(Yuengert, Anne)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers on 5/7/2020 by Terry L Hinton, Jr. Waiver of Service due by 7/6/2020. (Wiggins, Gregory)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry L Hinton, Jr. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/25/2020. (JLC)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry L Hinton, Jr. United States Pipe and Foundry Company LLC served on 4/30/2020, answer due 5/21/2020. (JLC)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, United States Pipe and Foundry Company LLC., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
April 27, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601105567 (MRR, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Terry L Hinton, Jr. (MRR, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Terry L Hinton, Jr.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinton v. United States Pipe and Foundry Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L Hinton, Jr
Represented By: Gregory O Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Represented By: Richard P Rouco
Represented By: George N Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Pipe and Foundry Company LLC
Represented By: Cortlin Lee Bond
Represented By: Anne R Yuengert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?