Willis et al v. Sweet Homelife LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Willis and Pam Ganus
Defendant: Andrea Quick, Sweet Homelife LLC, Lorie McRee and Sweet Homelife Real Estate
Case Number: 2:2020cv00574
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 47:0151ta
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER- The defts' motion to stay (Doc #13 ) is GRANTED to the extent this case, including the briefing schedule for the defts' motion to dismiss, is STAYED until the earlier of (1) the date on which the Court issues its decision in Barr or (2) July 31, 2020; To the extent the Court has not issued its decision in Barr by July 31, 2020, the defts may seek a further extension of the stay from the undersigned, to the extent the case remains with her pursuant to unanimous consent, and otherwise from the district judge to whom the case is reassigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/24/20. (MRR, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Case Pending the United States Supreme Court's Decision on the Constitutionality of the TCPA In BARR by Lorie McRee, Andrea Quick, Sweet Homelife LLC, Sweet Homelife Real Estate. (Black, Dylan)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 31, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 31, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on July 1, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/18/20. (MRR, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: On June 16, 2020, defendants Sweet Homelife, LLC, Lorie McRee, and Andrea Quick filed a motion to dismiss. (Doc. #9 ). The plaintiff are ORDERED to file a response to the motion within fourteen (14) calendar days from the entry date of this order. The moving defendants shall file any reply within seven (7) calendar days from the date on which the plaintiffs response is due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/18/20. (MRR, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Brief MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT filed by Lorie McRee, Andrea Quick, Sweet Homelife LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a-Declaration of Lorie McRee)(Black, Dylan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Lorie McRee, Andrea Quick, Sweet Homelife LLC. (Black, Dylan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lorie McRee, Andrea Quick, Sweet Homelife LLC. filed by Lorie McRee, Andrea Quick, Sweet Homelife LLC (Black, Dylan)
June 10, 2020 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer; Answer(s) shall now be due 6/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 5/29/2020. (SJB)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint Motion is RIPE 5/29/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Lorie McRee, Andrea Quick, Sweet Homelife LLC. (Black, Dylan)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Willis, Pam Ganus. Sweet Homelife Real Estate served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (KAM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Willis. Lorie McRee served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020; Andrea Quick served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (KAM)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lorie McRee, Andrea Quick, Sweet Homelife Real Estate mailed certified mail (KAM)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Pam Ganus, Richard Willis. (KAM)
April 29, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3581037. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Lorie McRee, Andrea Quick, Sweet Homelife LLC, Sweet Homelife Real Estate, filed by Richard Willis, Pam Ganus.(KAM). (McFerrin, James)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lorie McRee, Andrea Quick, Sweet Homelife LLC, Sweet Homelife Real Estate, filed by Richard Willis, Pam Ganus.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis et al v. Sweet Homelife LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Homelife LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie McRee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Homelife Real Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Willis
Represented By: James H McFerrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Ganus
Represented By: James H McFerrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?