Leigh King Norton & Underwood LLC v. Regions Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Leigh King Norton & Underwood LLC
Defendant: Regions Financial Corporation and Regions Bank
Case Number: 2:2020cv00591
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER finding as moot Regions Bank's #6 motion to dismiss and Regions Financial Corporation's #8 motion to dismiss in light of the filing of the Plaintiff's #13 amended complaint. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/23/2020. (KEK)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Regions Bank, filed by Leigh King Norton & Underwood LLC.(Aughtman, Jay)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Regions Financial Corporation - Plaintiff may file a response on or before June 22, 2020; a reply, if any, is due on or before June 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/8/20. (SAC)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Regions Bank - Plaintiff may file a response on or before June 22, 2020; a reply, if any, is due on or before June 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/8/20. (SAC)
June 5, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Judge Karon O Bowdre no longer assigned to the case. (JLC)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT-The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Karon O. Bowdre. Please use case number 2:20-cv-591 KOB on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation. filed by Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation (Childs, Larry)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Regions Financial Corporation. (Childs, Larry)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 Brief re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Regions Bank. (Childs, Larry)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion)(Childs, Larry)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leigh King Norton & Underwood LLC. Regions Bank served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; Regions Financial Corporation served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (AKD)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Leigh King Norton & Underwood LLC. (Aughtman, Jay)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Regions Bank and Regions Financial Corporation mailed certiifed mail. (AKD)
May 8, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3586473, NDAL receipt #B4601105821. (Aughtman, Jay) Modified on 5/8/2020 (JLC).
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Regions Bank and Regions Financial Corporation, filed by Leigh King Norton & Underwood LLC.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leigh King Norton & Underwood LLC v. Regions Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh King Norton & Underwood LLC
Represented By: Adam Brandon Burchell
Represented By: Richard D Morrison
Represented By: Jay Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?