White v. Best Buy et al
Plaintiff: Aaron White
Defendant: Apple, Sting, Google, YouTube, Walmart Corporation, Amazon, Ed Sheeran, Best Buy and Atlantic Records
Case Number: 2:2020cv00612
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:20-cv-612-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. (MRR, )
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER- The Court's January 2, 2015 General Order calls for reassignment to a district judge following the occurrence of the first of three "triggering events" absent unanimous consent; None of these events have occurred in this case, and it appears no such event will occur in a timely manner; The case is due to be assigned to a district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/8/20. (MRR, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re service by Aaron White. (KEK)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon, Best Buy, Google, Ed Sheeran, Sting, Walmart Corporation, YouTube, Atlantic Records, filed by Aaron White.(KEK)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Aaron White.(JLC)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER- Plaintiff Aaron White's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED to the extent White may commence this action without paying the filing fee and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent the undersigned declines to appoint an attorney to represent White in this action at this time; Moreover, White is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing within fourteen (14) calendar days from the entry date of this order why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction; Finally, to the extent White is able to demonstrate a basis for exercising federal subject matter jurisdiction, he also MUST file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) calendar days from the entry date of this order that addresses the factual insufficiency of his original complaint; Service of process will not begin unless and until White establishes a basis for the exercise of federal subject matter jurisdiction and files an amended complaint that complies with this order; Further instructions within. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/29/20. (MRR, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re service by Aaron White. (JLC)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon, Apple, Best Buy, Google, Ed Sheeran, Sting, Walmart Corporation, YouTube, filed by Aaron White.(JLC)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 5/1/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Aaron White. (MRR, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Aaron White.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Best Buy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Sheeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?