Watson v. Xpress Partners LLC
Plaintiff: Roderick Watson
Defendant: Xpress Partners LLC and Xpress Partners LLC doing business as Havoline Xpress Lube and Tire Pros
Case Number: 2:2020cv00625
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roderick Watson. Xpress Partners LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/2/2020. (Edwards, Blake)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Roderick Watson as to Xpress Partners LLC. (MRR, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Xpress Partners LLC, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
May 11, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3587641 (ALND reciept# B4601105864). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Xpress Partners LLC, filed by Roderick Watson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Edwards, Nicole) Modified on 5/11/2020 (AKD).
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Roderick Watson. (MRR, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xpress Partners LLC, filed by Roderick Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Xpress Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xpress Partners LLC
Represented By: Joshua S Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xpress Partners LLC doing business as Havoline Xpress Lube and Tire Pros
Represented By: Joshua S Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Watson
Represented By: Blake Clifton Edwards
Represented By: Nicole Davis Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?