Salter v. Scott Services Inc
Plaintiff: Christine Salter
Defendant: Scott Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00651
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/26/20. (SAC)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:20 CV 651 ACA on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Scott Services Inc.(Keller, Robert)
June 10, 2020 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge John H England, III. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The docket sheet does not show that the filing fee has been paid in this case; nor does it show that a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) has been filed. Plaintiff SHALL either pay the fee or file a motion for IFP by March 18, 2020, or this case will be subject to dismissal without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 05/12/2020. (SUH)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scott Services Inc. filed by Scott Services Inc (Keller, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Services Inc. Scott Services Inc waiver sent on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Keller, Robert)
May 11, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601105855 Electronically paid 5-8-2020 (KAM)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Services Inc, filed by Christine Salter.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salter v. Scott Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Services Inc
Represented By: Robert Clois Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Salter
Represented By: David Jeremy Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?